THE CHISLEHURST SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chislehurst Society is a voluntary organisation in the heart of the village, striving to bring people together to protect, preserve and enhance where we live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bromley
Governance
- 07 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Richmond | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Rowe | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dale Malcolm | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephan Smith JP | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard John Green | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jane Pearson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Frank St John Dwight | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER DEARING | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lamb | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Ely JP | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Joanna Dorothea Friel | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.41k | £96.15k | £110.74k | £86.79k | £100.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.77k | £86.46k | £108.15k | £121.98k | £132.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.77k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC ENVIRONMENTAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Linked charities
- 07 April 1989 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Queens Passage
Chislehurst
BR7 5AP
- Phone:
- 02084670900
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window