ROTARY CLUB OF ILFRACOMBE COMPASS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1167505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity organises Fund Raising Events collections and receives Donations. Specific fund raising events include organising and running a 10k Beach Run, Children in Need, Music Nights for Syrian Children Fund joint Venture organising Star Trek Night Walk and other sponsorship events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £2,632
Total expenditure: £9,093

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Barry Auger Trustee 04 June 2022
THE LYNTON AND BARNSTAPLE RAILWAY TRUST
Received: On time
Raymond John Wooff Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
Howard Joseph Lowe Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
STEPHEN DEREK LONG Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.37k £7.22k £16.43k £2.04k £2.63k
Total expenditure £6.46k £2.37k £12.01k £6.17k £9.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 September 2024 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 July 2023 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THOMAS WESTCOTT
96 HIGH STREET
ILFRACOMBE
EX34 9NH
Phone:
01271863662
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available