CHURCH OF OUR SAVIOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of our Saviour is a Single Congregation Local Ecumenical Partnership between the Church of England and The United Reformed Church. It is the Church for Chelmer Village and Chancellor Park and its address is Ashton Place, Chelmsford. CM2 6ST
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 14 October 2016: Standard registration
- CHURCH OF OUR SAVIOUR, CHELMER VILLAGE (Working name)
- CHURCH OF OUR SAVIOUR, EAST SPRINGFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Paul Greaves-Brown | Chair | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Owen Richard Edwards | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David N Miles | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Somers | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Gary Clayton | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Martin Cottis | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Mary Hughes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwilym Morris | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE Edwards | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY STANDING | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE MUSSELWHITE | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev MANDY HEWSON | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.72k | £111.28k | £84.53k | £74.55k | £85.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.73k | £81.10k | £68.76k | £83.93k | £103.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 2016 as amended on 23 Apr 2023 as amended on 24 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Of Our Saviour
Ashton Place
CHELMSFORD
CM2 6ST
- Phone:
- 07817 553453
- Email:
- hello@churchoos.org.uk
- Website:
-
churchoos.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window