THE HEPWORTH WAKEFIELD GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of The Hepworth Wakefield Garden for the benefit of the public together with such other uses in connection with the adjacent The Hepworth Wakefield gallery including but not limited to display of art, educational activities for adults and children, catering facilities and public events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Langan | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Shaun Parker | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Stuart Fletcher | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.22k | £47.87k | £2.28k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £354.54k | £147.89k | £125.47k | £199.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE WORKS OF BARBARA HEPWORTH, THROUGH THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE HEPWORTH WAKEFIELD GARDEN WITHIN WAKEFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hepworth Wakefield
Gallery Walk
WAKEFIELD
WF1 5AW
- Phone:
- 01924247203
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window