MEDIEVAL COVENTRY

Charity Number: 1171572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sharing knowledge about Coventry in the Middle Ages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,174
Total expenditure: £2,855

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MARK WEBB Chair 01 May 2007
HISTORIC COVENTRY TRUST
Received: On time
Hannah Khan Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Ryan Young Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
Steve Parry Mr Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Emma MacLellan Trustee 15 August 2017
None on record
LUKE BRYANT Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
AMANDA KAY Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.88k £10.65k £7.46k £4.42k £1.17k
Total expenditure £6.25k £8.37k £11.38k £7.40k £2.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21b-21d Lindfield Gardens
LONDON
NW3 6PX
Phone:
07740817309