TYNE AND WEAR BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is governed by its constitution and its main objective is to preserve for the benefit of the public generally and especially for the inhabitants of the County of Tyne and Wear, buildings (including artefacts and land) which are of special historic, architectural, or townscape interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £268,566 from 8 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 11 September 1979: Standard registration
- BUTTRESS (Working name)
- TYNE AND WEAR BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED (ALSO KNOWN AS "BUTTRESS") (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Madeleine Jacques | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Mayes | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Wilson | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Mitchell | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Wyatt | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Mary Watson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Robin Patrick Underwood | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dyer | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Murphy | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katie Sussams | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Maurice Burns | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neveen Ahmed Hamza | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roger Thompson | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHONA ALEXANDER | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bozic MBE | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £536.26k | £1.07m | £541.24k | £769.62k | £484.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £460.30k | £820.36k | £555.58k | £844.59k | £586.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.30k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £142.37k | £261.21k | £353.69k | £606.63k | £268.57k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £347.04k | £832.26k | £358.93k | £608.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £189.22k | £158.03k | £142.89k | £132.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £25.16k | £28.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £82.11k | £14.27k | £325 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £460.30k | £820.36k | £555.58k | £844.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.06k | £26.97k | £29.08k | £115.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 FEBRUARY 1981 , 10 MARCH 1982 AND 5 NOVEMBER 1991. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUL 2021 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1)To preserve for the benefit of the public generally and especially for the inhabitants of the county of Tyne and Wear, buildings (including artefacts and land) which are of especial historic or architectural or townscape interest. 2) The promotion for the benefit of the public of urban or rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation (and in particular in the county of Tyne and Wear) including by: a)The provision of housing for those who are in conditions of need and the improvement of housing in the public sector or in charitable ownership provided that such power shall not extend to relieving any local authorities or other bodies of a statutory duty to provide or improve housing; b) The maintenance, improvement or provision of public amenities; c) The creation of training and employment opportunities by the provision of workspace, buildings and/or land for use on favourable terms.? 3) The promotion of the effective use of resources for charitable purposes by charitable and non-charitable bodies for the benefit of the public by the provision of workspace, buildings and/or land for use on favourable terms.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Marley Lodge
Muscott Grove
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 6TT
- Phone:
- 01912753765
- Email:
- corrina@twbpt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window