MORECAMBE BAY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1173489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Morecambe Bay Partnership celebrates and encourages greater understanding and enjoyment of the Bay area's natural, cultural and historic assets; conserves the unique wildlife, culture and heritage; connects people with their place and with one another to improve their quality of life; and collaborates with key partners and the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £493,978
Total expenditure: £626,977

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2017: CIO registration
  • 20 June 2022: Funds received from 1089559 MORECAMBE BAY PARTNERSHIP
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerry McLoughlin Chair 20 June 2017
None on record
Mark Hawker Trustee 17 January 2025
None on record
Alistair Eagles Trustee 17 January 2025
None on record
Lucy Baird Trustee 17 January 2025
None on record
Dr Paul Salveson Trustee 17 January 2025
None on record
Helen Kemp Trustee 17 August 2023
None on record
Harrison Stewart Trustee 17 August 2023
LANCASTER UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Received: On time
Georgina Young Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Mark Holroyd Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Amanda Delia Finan Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
THOMAS BURDITT Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
EMMA PARSONS Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £352.95k £336.84k £361.93k £524.83k £493.98k
Total expenditure £237.35k £328.58k £422.53k £485.05k £626.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £67.53k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £181.42k £13.93k £175.48k £322.07k £342.42k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £7.08k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £512.28k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5.47k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £455.90k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £29.16k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £5.35k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stricklandgate House
92 Stricklandgate
KENDAL
CUMBRIA
LA9 4PU
Phone:
07880 345754