DOG BREEDING REFORM GROUP

Charity Number: 1176163
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote humane behaviour towards animals by providing and supporting initiatives to improve dog welfare based on breeding and rearing practices. To inform the general public about irresponsible dog breeding in order to make them aware of the potential impact on their dogs' health and welfare.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021

Total income: £6,152
Total expenditure: £3,613

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2017: Standard registration
  • 04 August 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 04 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1195705 DOG BREEDING REFORM GROUP (DBRG)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £2.32k £6.59k £6.15k
Total expenditure £2.58k £4.39k £3.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 March 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required