SAMARITANS EALING BRANCH

Charity Number: 1173588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Samaritans Ealing is a charity aimed at providing emotional support to anyone in emotional distress, struggling to cope, or at risk of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £76,776
Total expenditure: £67,097

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing
  • Hammersmith And Fulham
  • Hounslow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • EALING, HAMMERSMITH AND HOUNSLOW SAMARITANS (Working name)
  • THE EALING SAMARITANS (Working name)
  • THE SAMARITANS OF EALING (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dermot Peter Doughty Trustee 13 November 2023
THE VICTORIA LEAGUE FOR COMMONWEALTH FRIENDSHIP
Received: On time
Joan Moon Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Luke Moores Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
David Andrew Arch Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Sally Everson Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Roger Green Trustee 12 February 2018
None on record
Robert Jackson Trustee 12 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.84k £32.80k £74.75k £16.42k £76.78k
Total expenditure £25.35k £27.57k £33.30k £30.41k £67.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 May 2024 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 May 2024 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES AS AMENDED 17TH SEPTEMBER 1973, 22ND JANUARY 1986, 22ND APRIL 1998 AND 06 APRIL 2006. RULES AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 03 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN EALING,HAMMERSMITH AND HOUNSLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA(BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE,REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 02 October 1979 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
26 JUNCTION ROAD
LONDON
W5 4XL
Phone:
02085602345