ORCHESTRA PRO ANIMA

Charity number: 1176594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the arts for the public benefit by the promotion of the art of classical music in England amd Wales in particular, but not exclusively, including children and young musicians in rehearsal and performances.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £23,820
Total expenditure: £25,290

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER SHEERAN Chair 01 January 2018
THE ELGAR SCHOOL OF MUSIC LIMITED
Received: On time
GILLIAN MARGARET LUMSDON Trustee 01 January 2018
CHIPPING CAMPDEN SURGERY FRIENDS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MS HELENA CAVAN Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £17.56k £2.06k £21.64k £26.23k £23.82k
Total expenditure £17.26k £1.55k £20.48k £20.69k £25.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ARDLEY HOUSE
BACK ENDS
CHIPPING CAMPDEN
GL55 6AU
Phone:
07770883091
Website:

orchestraproanima.co.uk