DAVID SCOTT'S COVENTRY JUBILEE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance to the sick and needy in Coventry either by direct payment to indivduals or by the provision of medical equipment and services . Our aim is to provide this help within 48hrs of receiving the request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 February 1981: Standard registration
- THE COVENTRY JUBILEE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR J A MCINTOSH | Chair | 12 March 1981 |
|
|||||||||||
Simon Sharpe | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Kirstie Kelly | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Cantillon | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Caroline Ann Rhodes | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.14k | £152.97k | £166.63k | £193.94k | £199.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.64k | £158.82k | £183.80k | £195.79k | £205.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/01/1981 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 29/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE SUPPLY OF EQUIPMENT TO AND FOR THE CARE OF THE SICK POOR WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT EITHER BY DIREST PAYMENT TO INDIVIDUALS OR BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES OR CONTRIUBTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME TO SUCH INDIVIDUALS OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND FUNDS AS MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION BE CHOSEN BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF COVENTRY BOUNDARIES AT 1/9/1980 AND 10 MILES BEYOND
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 ROUNCIL LANE
KENILWORTH
CV8 1FP
- Phone:
- 01926853044
- Email:
- alandalmac@aol.com
- Website:
-
105RouncilLaneKenilworth.CV81FP
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window