CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CTIM brings togerther representatives from Churches in March to promote the Christian faith through ecumenical services & activities; raising funds for Christian Aid; supporting & providing volunteers for the March Foodbank; collecting Shoe Boxes for the Samaritan's Purse Christmas Appeal;participating in town-wide events such as the Annual Christmas Lights Switch-On; promoting church activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jane Beckwith | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Thomas Martin Wells | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Simon Leigh Goddard | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW PAUL CLARKE | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.09k | £8.42k | £9.79k | £9.94k | £11.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.98k | £7.46k | £11.44k | £9.13k | £11.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MARCH SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINE AND PRACTICES OF THE CONSTITUENT CHURCHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WHERRY CLOSE
MARCH
PE15 9BX
- Phone:
- 01354650855
- Email:
- revdjennywebb@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window