JOSEPH HARDY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by providing a Heritage Centre in Henley-in-Arden in order to display the historical records of the town To protect and preserve for the benefit of the public such documents, records, archives and artefacts as are of local historical interest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 12 July 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Marie Shuttleworth | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARIE Warner | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
norman kench | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LODDER | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN C L DOVEY | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.07k | £42.10k | £20.36k | £9.46k | £4.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.24k | £6.26k | £19.27k | £11.41k | £15.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.04k | £16.00k | £3.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 245 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 May 2021 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 May 2021 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF HENLEY-IN-ARDEN AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING SO FAR AND SO FAR ONLY AS THE SAME ARE LEGALLY CHARITABLE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF HENLEY-IN-ARDEN BY THE PROVISION OF A HERITAGE CENTRE (2) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Linked charities
- 12 July 1995 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Henley in Arden Heritage Centre
Joseph Hardy House
150 High Street
Henley-in-Arden
B95 5BS
- Phone:
- 01564 795919
- Email:
- admin@heritagehenley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window