THE VENTURERS NORFOLK BROADS CRUISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST EXISTS TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND CHARACTER TRAINING BOTH PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WITHIN A RELIGIOUS FRAMEWORK (AS SHOWN BY THE BASIS OF BELIEF BELOW) FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 18 BY GIVING TRAINING AND EXPERIENCE IN SEAMANSHIP, NAVIGATION AND BOAT HANDLING. This objective was met by running a sailing holiday on the Norfolk Broads during April 2019
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 2018: CIO registration
- 10 February 2022: Funds received from 262348 THE VENTURERS NORFOLK BROADS CRUISE
- THE VENTURERS (Working name)
- THE VENTURERS CRUISE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN DUNCAN SMITH | Chair | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martha Jarvis | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Spradbery | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Amy Carrick | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mary Glover | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ROBIN ELPHICK | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATE ELIZABETH CHARLOTTE WOODBRIDGE | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN PAUL ROWLANDSON | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN GRAY | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.62k | £328 | £13.81k | £22.68k | £24.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.65k | £966 | £18.39k | £19.95k | £24.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 AND ABOVE THROUGH BIBLE STUDY, DISCUSSION, PRAYER AND WORSHIP. (B) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 AND ABOVE THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SAILING AND ALLIED ACTIVITIES, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (II) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SAILING AND ALLIED ACTIVITIES, WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. PARTICIPANTS ARE ASKED TO PAY A FEE SUFFICIENT TO COVER THE COSTS OF THE ACTIVITY, WHILST BURSARY FUNDS HELD BY THE CIO MAY BE UTILISED TO COVER ALL OR PART OF THE FEE IN CASES WHERE THE CHARITY TRUSTEES CONSIDER THIS IS APPROPRIATE. THE CIO IS NOT SEEKING TO EARN PROFIT FROM THESE ACTIVITIES: RESERVES AND THE BURSARY FUND ARE SECURED BY VOLUNTARY DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 CONIFER CREST
NEWBURY
RG14 6RS
- Phone:
- 07867504951
- Email:
- info@venturers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window