THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL CORNHILL

Charity Number: 1179240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Choral evensong, other midweek services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £201,665
Total expenditure: £165,823

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 2018: Standard registration
  • 24 January 2019: Funds received from 287257 THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CORNHILL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE PCC OF ST MICHAEL CORNHILL (Working name)
  • THE PCC OF ST MICHAEL'S CORNHILL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev HENRY GASKELL EATOCK-TAYLOR Chair 19 April 2017
None on record
Jonathan Christopher Wolstenholme Trustee 24 August 2022
None on record
The Rev'd Andrew Peter Balch Trustee 06 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE
Received: On time
Rupert Waldo Meacher Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Helen Isabel White Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Mary Anna Vander Steen Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Samuel Yee-Lee Hung Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Xuankun Liu Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
DEBORAH RUTH BUGGS Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Dr LINDEN RUTH WEBSTER Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
RUPERT JEREMY CHRISTOPHER DOBLE PHELPS Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Alderman Robert Picton Seymour Howard Trustee 19 April 2017
THE HONOURABLE THE IRISH SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GARDENERS OF LONDON CHARITY
Received: On time
DAVID DUNCAN COODE MONRO Trustee 19 April 2017
THE BREWCROFT TRUST
Received: On time
THE ZIMBIALA TRUST
Received: On time
THE JEFFERISS RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE ALLIGATOR TRUST
Received: 12 days late
GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONFESSING ANGLICANS
Received: On time
JANET MARY TAYLOR Trustee 19 April 2017
THE BOWERMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PAUL ADRIAN PRITCHETT Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £115.62k £76.51k £130.73k £140.21k £201.67k
Total expenditure £135.34k £99.57k £95.69k £133.31k £165.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Church of St. Michael Cornhill
St. Michael's Alley
LONDON
EC3V 9DS
Phone:
02072833121