THE LONGUEVILLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The funds may be applied for any charitable purposes within the County of Herefordshire, but the Trustees will give special consideration for the relief of sick and convalescent persons in Herefordshire and to charitable purposes in the Eardisley & Kington districts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 09 March 1982: Standard registration
- 13 September 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 13 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1167802 THE CART SHED CHARITY
- THE LONGVILLE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £1.19k | £1.19k | £745 | £170 | |
|
Total expenditure | £318 | £1.68k | £1.68k | £1.23k | £2.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 November 2019 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 OCTOBER 1981, AS AMENDED UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD INCLUDING (A) CHARITIES ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF SICK AND CONVALESCENT PERSONS IN THE SAID COUNTY OR (B) CHARITIES ESTABLISHED FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE DISTRICTS OF EARDISLEY AND KINGTON IN THE SAID COUNTY.
Area of benefit
HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, EARDISLEY AND KINGTON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window