FORMATIO

Charity number: 1182947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary objective of Formatio is to advance the Catholic Religion for the public benefit by supporting Catholic Education and, in particular, promoting the formation of teachers, leaders and governors in Catholic Education. Formatio aims to bring together key stakeholders and membership of the national Steering Group reflects this.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £250
Total expenditure: £11,235

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE ANNE BRYAN Chair 11 April 2018
None on record
Jane Bradley Trustee 20 November 2024
None on record
Sarah Harcombe-Barreto Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Joan Mary McCarthy Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Flavio Vettese Trustee 01 March 2024
GREAT YARMOUTH EXHIBITION CHARITY
Received: On time
THE GREAT YARMOUTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Angela Keller Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Sister Patricia Goodstadt Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Stephen Bell Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Helen O'Neill Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Patrick Murden Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Dr Jane Chambers Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Peter Sweeney Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Peter Giorgio Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Dr Duncan Martin Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
PROFESSOR ARTHUR NAYLOR Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record
Paul Barber Trustee 11 April 2018
SAINT WILLIAM OF YORK YOUTH GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days
CHRIST'S AND NOTRE DAME COLLEGE, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING
Received: On time
ST MARY'S UNIVERSITY, TWICKENHAM
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Cathedrals Group of Universities
Received: On time
EDMUND PLOWDEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE DON BROOME SCOUT TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Alan Stephen Williams sm Trustee 11 April 2018
BRENTWOOD DIOCESEAN CATHEDRAL AND CHORAL TRUST FUND
Received: 90 days late
THE REVEREND CANON FRANCIS WALTER GILBERT FOR THE CHURCH OF OUR LADY OF LOURDES AND ST JOSEPH, LEIGH-ON-SEA
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
NOTRE DAME REFUGEE CENTRE
Received: On time
NOTRE DAME DE FRANCE – SOCIETY OF MARY
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF MARY (MARIST FATHERS) CIO
Received: On time
MARGARET SUE CRONIN Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £250.00k £0 £10.25k £250
Total expenditure £85.90k £96.81k £46.66k £11.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE
39 ECCLESTON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1V 1BX
Phone:
02079011900
Website:

formatio.org.uk