THE HOLOCAUST MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities involve remembering and developing learning on the Holocaust and the historical context in which it occurred. The charity's primary activity is to support (by grant-funding) the establishment and subsequent operation of a new UK Holocaust Memorial and Learning Centre which is proposed to be built in Victoria Tower Gardens, London, adjacent to the Houses of Parliament.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR GERALD MAURICE RONSON CBE | Chair | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sir Lloyd Marshall Dorfman | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Natasha Kaplinsky | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Lord Stuart Polak | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Lord Eric Jack Pickles Lord Pickles | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Geoffrey FREEMAN | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Lord Andrew Simon Feldman Lord Feldman | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Edward Michael Balls | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.00k | £20.02k | £10.00k | £5.05k | £6.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.21k | £26.84k | £22.70k | £6.54k | £5.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY WAY OF MAKING GRANTS: (A) TO PROMOTE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT BY REMEMBERING AND REFLECTING UPON THE HOLOCAUST IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE PROPOSED HOLOCAUST MEMORIAL AND LEARNING CENTRE AT VICTORIA GARDENS IN LONDON; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THE HOLOCAUST AND HUMAN RIGHTS, IN PARTICULAR DEMOCRACY AND THE POLITICAL CONTEXT IN WHICH THE HOLOCAUST OCCURRED AND THE IMPORTANCE OF PROTECTING MINORITIES WITHIN A DEMOCRACY; (C) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY • RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES • PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATION. (D) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RELIGION, RACE, DISABILITY AND SEXUAL ORIENTATION; AND (E) TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE WHICH RELATE TO THE HOLOCAUST OR GENOCIDE OR PERSECUTION MORE GENERALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Grosvenor Street
LONDON
W1K 4QN
- Phone:
- 020 7380 4974
- Email:
- jtrent@hwfisher.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window