NATIONAL OCEANOGRAPHY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NOC is a marine science research and technology institution which undertakes integrated sea level science, coastal and deep ocean research and technology development. NOC contribute to the advancement of scientific knowledge of the ocean and support education and training of scientists, engineers and marine professionals and engaging the public with the science of the ocean and its implications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£86,213,000
Donations and legacies | £77.53m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £7.21m | |
Investments | £1.42m | |
Other | £62.00k |
Total expenditure:
£81,640,000
Raising funds | £2.63m | |
Charitable activities | £79.02m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,945,000 from 18 government contract(s) and £70,781,000 from 101 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.63m | |
Charitable expenditure | £79.02m | |
Retained for future use | £4.57m |
People

722 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 50 |
£70k to £80k | 28 |
£80k to £90k | 6 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Belize
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Chile
- China
- Dominica
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- Germany
- Grenada
- Guyana
- India
- Indonesia
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Madagascar
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Papua New Guinea
- Samoa
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Tonga
- Tuvalu
- United States
- Vanuatu
- Vietnam
Governance
- 11 September 2019: Standard registration
- NOC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jeremy Darroch | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Lisa Maureen Collins | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
John Francis Clarke | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr HOSEIN KHAJEH-HOSSEINY | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Clare Mary Petre Harbord | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
David Keith McSweeney | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Dixon | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Sir Ian Lamont Boyd | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
DR RUTH SUSAN BOUMPHREY | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
SARAH MICHELLE MCMATH | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
DANIEL JAMES HOOK | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.94m | £67.14m | £78.72m | £85.40m | £86.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.59m | £66.76m | £74.09m | £85.20m | £81.64m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.07m | £2.10m | £1.68m | £1.64m | £1.95m | |
|
Income from government grants | £438.00k | £688.00k | £73.14m | £64.61m | £70.78m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £77.59m | £63.01m | £73.16m | £75.71m | £77.53m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.96m | £3.70m | £4.31m | £6.38m | £7.21m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.62m | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £19.00k | £3.00k | £18.00k | £444.00k | £1.42m | |
|
Income - Other | £7.00k | £428.00k | £1.23m | £244.00k | £62.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £57.19m | £66.32m | £72.94m | £82.57m | £79.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £394.00k | £0 | £0 | £2.63m | £2.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £255.00k | £171.00k | £253.00k | £524.00k | £464.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £442.00k | £1.16m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.56m | £16.54m | £15.69m | £14.41m | £16.66m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £31.10m | £68.57m | £60.47m | £51.43m | £48.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £25.31m | £61.38m | £49.08m | £38.57m | £33.53m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 2018 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, IN PARTICULAR ENHANCING THE SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF OCEANOGRAPHIC SCIENCES, AND THE OCEAN AND ITS INTERACTION WITH THE EARTH SYSTEM, AND FACILITATING THE USE AND APPLICATION OF THAT KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING, PARTICULARLY BY: 4.1.1.1 UNDERTAKING AND CAUSING TO BE UNDERTAKEN RESEARCH INCLUDING THROUGH TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT, EXPERIMENTATION, ANALYSIS, LONG-TERM OCEAN OBSERVATION, MONITORING, MAPPING, SURVEY AND MODELLING OF A HIGH INTERNATIONAL STANDARD AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH; 4.1.1.2 PROVIDING ACCESS TO SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT FACILITIES AND INFRASTRUCTURE INCLUDING RESEARCH SHIPS AND OTHER MEASUREMENT PLATFORMS AND SYSTEMS TO THE OCEAN SCIENCE COMMUNITY; 4.1.1.3 OBTAINING, MANAGING, CURATING AND PROVIDING ACCESS TO DIGITAL DATA, SAMPLES AND OTHER SPECIMENS; 4.1.1.4 BEING THE UK NATIONAL FOCUS FOR OCEAN SCIENCE, EXERCISING LEADERSHIP FOR AND PROMOTING CO-OPERATION WITH THE WIDER UNITED KINGDOM SCIENCE COMMUNITY, AND PROVIDING NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL VISIBILITY AND EXPERT REPRESENTATION FOR OCEANOGRAPHIC SCIENCES; 4.1.1.6 INNOVATION OR BY ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING INNOVATION; 4.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN OCEANOGRAPHIC SCIENCES, AND THE OCEAN AND ITS INTERACTION WITH THE EARTH SYSTEM AND RELATIONSHIP WITH PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BY: 4.1.2.1 CONTRIBUTING TO THE EDUCATION (PARTICULARLY POSTGRADUATE HIGHER EDUCATION), TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE NEXT GENERATION OF SCIENTISTS, ENGINEERS, TECHNOLOGISTS INCLUDING THE SUPERVISION OF POSTGRADUATE RESEARCH STUDENTS; 4.1.2.2 SUPPORTING THE BUILDING OF MARINE RESEARCH SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL CAPACITY IN OTHER COUNTRIES AROUND THE WORLD; 4.1.2.3 COMMUNICATING WITH AND ENGAGING WITH THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO OCEAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY THROUGH SEMINARS, TALKS, LEAFLETS, PAPERS AND OTHER MEANS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL OCEANOGRAPHY CENTRE
WATERFRONT CAMPUS
EUROPEAN WAY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 3ZH
- Phone:
- 02380596666
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window