ARLINGTON GARDEN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set up to lead volunteer gardening sessions in Arlington Garden. We bring volunteers together monthly to undertake maintenance and improvements in the garden to enable the garden to be used by local residents and visitors. We arrange fundraising activities to enable purchase of tools for gardening and provide other amenity items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 01 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE DIX | Chair | 30 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Sargent | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Rodgerson | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barnes | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £1.13k | £1.67k | £522 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £782 | £1.45k | £163 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE A.TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF ARLINGTON GARDEN (ALSO KNOWN AS VICTORIA PARK) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND VISITORS THROUGH TRUSTEE LED VOLUNTEER MAINTENANCE SESSIONS AND FUNDRAISING FOR RESTORATION. B.TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN FOR INDIVIDUALS IN CLIFTON EAST, BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. C.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR COMMUNITY GARDEN VOLUNTEERS TO LEARN ABOUT HORTICULTURE IN AND AROUND THE COMMUNITY GARDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Welford House
51 Bristol Road
Keynsham
BRISTOL
BS31 2BP
- Phone:
- 01174011077
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window