BASINGSTOKE & DISTRICT YOUNG CARERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Basingstoke & District Young Carers provides respite support to children and young people aged 8- 18. in the form of weekly young carers clubs or activities. Information, advice and guidance is provided to the children, young people and their families through either: school based sessions, 1-2-1 sessions, parent support groups or family activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £68,813 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 February 2019: CIO registration
- BASINGSTOKE YOUNG CARERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Thomas Pett | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lesley Dignan | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Meroncikaite | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER DAVID GARDINER | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Garrett | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Smith | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.39k | £89.18k | £64.83k | £82.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.81k | £77.62k | £59.39k | £77.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.34k | £27.78k | £17.08k | £68.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF YOUNG CARERS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY ESTABLISHING, DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING A SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE THAT RELIEVES THE NEEDS OF YOUNG CARERS, CARING FOR A FAMILY MEMBER WHO HAS A LONG-TERM ILLNESS, DISABILITY OR ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS AND RESIDE WITHIN THE AREA OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF BASINGSTOKE & DEANE AND COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basingstoke & District Young Carers
The Orchard
White Hart Lane
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG21 4AF
- Phone:
- 01256 423824
- Email:
- office@bdyc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window