LEEDS TRINITY STUDENTS UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
106 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 01 July 2019: CIO registration
- 08 January 2020: Funds received from 1151574 LEEDS TRINITY STUDENTS UNION
- LTSU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maddeleine Goodhand | Chair | 26 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Murtough | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Mark Caress | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Ann Coton | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Isla Louise Randall | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asim Mahmood | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £441.73k | £336.91k | £413.33k | £477.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £391.28k | £319.84k | £422.96k | £425.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A MEDIUM OF COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THE MEMBERS OF THE UNION, THE GOVERNORS, THE COLLEGE AND OTHER BODIES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND STUDENTS OF THE COLLEGE AS A WHOLE. 3. TO REPRESENT THE INTEREST OF ITS MEMBERS AND ACT AS A CHANNEL OF COMMUNICATION IN DEALING WITH THE COLLEGE AND OTHER BODIES. 4. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ACTIVITIES. 5. TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND CO-ORDINATE STUDENT CLUBS, SOCIETIES, SPORTS AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEEDS TRINITY STUDENTS' UNION
BROWNBERRIE LANE
HORSFORTH
LEEDS
LS18 5HD
- Phone:
- 01132837276
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window