CHRISTIAN OUTREACH MISSION EDUCATION (COME)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to provide for the advancement of the Christian religion for the public benefit by supporting Christian charities that are registered with the Charity Commission for England, charities reaching out to international students studying in Tyne and Wear and charities reaching out to school aged children through school clubs, assemblies and holiday clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 10 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP BALLARD | Chair | 29 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev RAMZI PAUL ADCOCK | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
PHILIPPA JANE FORSYTH | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard John Frederic Ballard | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO REGISTERED, EXCEPTED AND EXEMPT CHARITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUTLAND
THE AVENUE
MEDBURN
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 0JD
- Phone:
- 07447721669
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window