URBAN LIFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Urban Life is a team of theological accompaniers who, through a range of programmes that weave together practical experience and current academic thinking, facilitate theological reflection with mission practitioners in marginalised communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Netherlands
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 November 2019: CIO registration
- 03 October 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 03 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1090734 URBAN EXPRESSION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.97k | £11.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.57k | £16.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CHRISTIAN THEOLOGY, IN PARTICULAR THE UNDERSTANDING OF URBAN ISSUES AND FAITH, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING: WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH HIGHER EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS TO PROVIDE ACCREDITED EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY DEVELOPING TRAINING PROGRAMMES FOR CHRISTIAN WORKERS THAT ENHANCE THEIR MISSIONAL PRACTICE, WITH A FOCUS ON PRACTICE IN MARGINAL URBAN CONTEXTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window