RUGBY METHODIST CHURCH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise and hold regular services available to all who wish to attend Offer pastoral support Run pre-school or parent & toddler groups Provide Food Banks Provide social support to elderly Provide food for homeless. Support local activities or groups (street pastors) Provide space for youth groups at reduced cost or for free Have a space available for prayer, reflection and worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 November 2019: Standard registration
- RMCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nathan Stuart Falla | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Adrian John Price | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Stephen Arthur | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorn Eileen Margetts | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dalzell Richard | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Isobella Henderson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Angela Hinds | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN MARGETTS | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Reinier Johannes Maria Rutte | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Beckett | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Regina Korlekuor Owusu | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH RICHARD | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Howard George Binns | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Linda Audrey Sore | Trustee | 01 May 1997 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Charles Sore | Trustee | 01 May 1997 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Heinink | Trustee | 01 May 1994 |
|
|||||
Dr COLIN RAYMOND BEMROSE | Trustee | 21 August 1984 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELLEN BEMROSE BSC | Trustee | 24 January 1984 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.66k | £150.02k | £148.71k | £104.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.27k | £104.80k | £143.73k | £112.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.91k | £31.98k | £1.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 01 JAN 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rugby Methodist Church
Russelheim Way
RUGBY
CV22 7TB
- Phone:
- 01788579068
- Email:
- rmccoffice95@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window