JEPSONS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Maintenance of Ripon Grammar School. Provision of scholarships,bursaries,maintenance allowances and financial assistance. The provision of facilities of any kind not normally provided by the local education authority.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Gogledd Swydd Gaerefrog
Llywodraethu
- 04 Hydref 2019: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Williams | Ymddiriedolwr | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN GILL | Ymddiriedolwr | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Noake | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Karen Butler | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Webb | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Very Reverend John Richard Dobson | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 October 2019 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £8.07k | £8.23k | £8.40k | £8.43k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £59.82k | £17.81k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 12 Mawrth 2025 | 40 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 19 Mehefin 2024 | 140 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 08 Mai 2023 | 97 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 25 Gorffennaf 2022 | 175 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 25 JAN 1927 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 DEC 1956
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE FEOFFEES MAY PAY SUCH YEARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT, BEING NOT MORE THAN ONE-THIRD OF THE SAID NET INCOME, TO THE GOVERNORS OF RIPON GRAMMAR SCHOOL TO BE APPLIED BY THEM TOWARDS THE COST OF ALTERATIONS OF, AND REPAIRS TO, THE PREMISES OF THE SAID SCHOOL SO THAT THEY CONFORM TO THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE EDUCATION ACTS, 1944 TO 1953, AND THE REGULATIONS MADE THEREUNDER. (1) THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE FEOFFEES IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:— (A) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING, APPROVED BY THE FEOFFEES; (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, A UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; (D) IN PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES OF ANY RIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COACHING IN ATHLETICS, SPORTS AND GAMES, FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RECEIVING PRIMARY, SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION; AND (E) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS: PROVIDED THAT AWARDS CONSISTING OF THE PAYMENT, OR PART PAYMENT, OF FEES SHALL BE CALLED JEPSON EXHIBITIONS. (2) WITHIN THE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY THIS SCHEME, THE FEOFFEES SHALL HAVE FULL POWER TO MAKE RULES FOR THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, OR OTHER BENEFITS, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE AWARDS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, AND METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION, OF BENEFICIARIES. (3) IN THIS CLAUSE THE EXPRESSION " BENEFICIARIES " MEANS BOYS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF RIPON WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE FEOFFEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS, OR HAVE BEEN ABANDONED OR DESERTED BY THEIR PARENTS OR GUARDIANS, OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE DIVORCED OR SEPARATED.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
RIPON GRAMMAR SCHOOL
16 CLOTHERHOLME ROAD
RIPON
HG4 2DG
- Ffôn:
- 01765602647
- E-bost:
- admin@ripongrammar.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window