POLISH STUDIES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to advance education of the public in, and support the academic study of, the history, literature, language, politics, economy, law, society, religion, philosophy and culture of Poland, and other areas of interest relating to Poland and its historical region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Norman Davies | Chair | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ania Zalewska | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Christian Richard Stefan Davies | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stanley Bill | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ranjit Edward Majumdar | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £38.89k | £24.98k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.18k | £25.35k | £25.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN, AND SUPPORT THE ACADEMIC STUDY OF THE HISTORY, LITERATURE LANGUAGE, POLITICS, ECONOMY, LAW, SOCIETY, RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY AND CULTURE OF POLAND, AND OTHER AREAS OF INTEREST RELATING TO POLAND AND ITS HISTORICAL REGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARRER & CO
65-66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
- Phone:
- 01865557429
- Email:
- norman@normandavies.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window