LARKIN100

Charity number: 1189969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Larkin100 will act as an arms-length co-ordinating body for planning, organizing, and promoting a range of cultural events that both celebrate the legacy of Philip Larkin during the centenary year of his birth in 2022 and help to generate new creative and artistic responses to it.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,083
Total expenditure: £1,040

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Philip Charles Pullen Chair 16 June 2020
THE PHILIP LARKIN SOCIETY
Received: On time
PROFESSOR GRAHAM CHESTERS Trustee 16 June 2020
Hull and East Riding Chess Association
Received: On time
THE JAMES RECKITT LIBRARY ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
THE PHILIP LARKIN SOCIETY
Received: On time
AMY JOHNSON ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD FRANCIS WELTON Trustee 16 June 2020
AMY JOHNSON ARTS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.00k £3.00k £6.69k £1.08k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.72k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Flemingate Court
BEVERLEY
HU17 0SZ
Phone:
07742266161
Website:

No information available