STOS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance of musical theatre and the furtherance of amateur theatre in Sheffield and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 06 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Michelle Horsfield | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rose Musgrove | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Siberry-Scott | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Annette Beckett | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Harris | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rose Sanders | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Janet Minott | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brownhill | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARGARET MCMURRAY | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Sally Marie Badham | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.67k | £115.02k | £108.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.10k | £100.21k | £118.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF OPERAS, OPERETTA, MUSICALS AND OTHER GENRES OF THEATRE INCLUDING PLAY READINGS, CONCERTS, EXCERPTS AND FULLY STAGED PERFORMANCES IN SHEFFIELD AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Old Hay Close
SHEFFIELD
S17 3GQ
- Phone:
- 01142362430
- Email:
- rjmcmurray@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window