OLDHAM, ROCHDALE AND TAMESIDE ORGANISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 516899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public in the study of the art of music, with special reference to liturgical and organ music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,982
Total expenditure: £2,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • O R T O A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward James McHale BSc Chair 23 April 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW
Received: On time
Dr Elizabeth Jane Cooper Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Joe Dawson Trustee 29 April 2017
FRIENDS OF ROCHDALE ART GALLERY
Received: On time
Graham Peter Chamberlain BA Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
BARRIE JOHN BRAILSFORD Trustee
None on record
PHILIP JOHN LOWE Trustee
None on record
MARK JOSEPH JOHNSON Trustee
CHADDERTON HISTORICAL AND HERITAGE SOCIETY CIO
Received: On time
EDWARD RIGG Trustee
CHARITY OF THOMAS HILL
Received: On time
ROCHDALE PHOENIX OPERA SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.59k £3.13k £2.91k £2.09k £1.98k
Total expenditure £3.82k £1.31k £4.47k £2.79k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 HIBSON AVENUE
ROCHDALE
OL12 7RU
Phone:
01706343163