CHEETAH CONSERVATION FUND - UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity undertakes to promote the conservation and protection of the cheetah and the ecosystems of their natural habitats through the provision of grants for conservation, education, research and promoting bio-diversity. The charity is affiliated with other Cheetah Conservation Fund charities across the Globe, the largest of which and the centre of the group's operations is based in Namibia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Spencer Phillips | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Julia Wall-Clarke | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Ahson Toru | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Katie-Ann Clements | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Laurence Morgan | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Jane Galton | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Giles Clark | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 04 January 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE CHEETAH AND OTHER PREDATORS, AND THE ECOSYSTEMS OF THEIR NATURAL HABITATS, INCLUDING LOCAL COMMUNITIES WHERE HUMANS AND CHEETAHS CO-EXIST, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR CONSERVATION, EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND PROMOTING BIO-DIVERSITY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Abbots Ride
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU9 8HZ
- Phone:
- 07960583827
- Email:
- jane@cheetah.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window