CONISTON MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescuing persons who are injured or suffer other misfortunes that require our assistance in the mountainous area around Coniston
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 01 December 2020: CIO registration
- 26 May 2023: Funds received from 504923 CONISTON MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ahmed Charif Abbas | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dean Trent Copley | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Russell Stephenson | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elisabeth Edwards | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ian Walker | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Ribchester | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Hamilton | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Coe | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY ROGER CARROLL | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Robert Frank Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £696.30k | £137.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £38.98k | £53.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £77.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £616.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £2.57k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £33.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £38.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS AND TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE SECURE AND EFFICIENT SEARCH AND RESCUE OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS SO ENDANGERED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CONISTON MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
MOUNTAIN RESCUE BASE
OLD FURNESS ROAD
CONISTON
LA21 8HU
- Phone:
- 07512350689
- Email:
- secretary@conistonmrt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window