THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, SHAMLEY GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of religious services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 March 2021: Standard registration
- SHAMLEY GREEN PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVEREND SALLY JANE DAVIES | Chair | 04 July 2006 |
|
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS GRAHAM RUSSELL-DAVIS | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
THOMAS BRIAN CORNWELL | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
JANICE MARGUERITE GOLDSMITH | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN WILLIS | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
ALISON JANE HARDING | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
JOELLE TAMRAZ | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Penelope Hodgson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
MARGARET GOODCHILD | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
KEVIN ANDREW GARVEY | Trustee | 25 April 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Anthony Robinson | Trustee | 25 April 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.80k | £93.43k | £100.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.87k | £97.04k | £106.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
CHURCH HILL
SHAMLEY GREEN
GUILDFORD
GU5 0UD
- Phone:
- 01483892030
- Email:
- info@shamleygreen.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window