HOPE CHURCH, ASHTON-IN-MAKERFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing the community of Ashton-in-Makerfield and beyond with the opportunity to learn about Christian faith and practice through the provision of public Bible teaching and Christian fellowship in a variety of ways. We also provide other activities of benefit for the local community, such as youth clubs and parents and toddlers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 18 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Richard Cornall | Chair | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Robert Davies | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Magleave | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Parsons | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Howard George Williams | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harold Heath | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICK WILLIAMS | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £115.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £82.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Jan 2021 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH (APPENDIX 1) PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN ASHTON-IN-MAKERFIELD WIGAN AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE CHURCH
24 HEATH ROAD
ASHTON-IN-MAKERFIELD
WN4 9DY
- Phone:
- 01942725621
- Email:
- michael@hopechurchashton.org
- Website:
-
hopechurchashton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window