BRECKNOCK GARDENING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talks and garden visits to enable members to improve their horticultural knowledge and also giving opportunities to seek advice. Helping in the local environment where appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 18 March 1986: Standard registration
- 19 December 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1036354 THE NATIONAL BOTANIC GARDEN OF WALES
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1145211 BRECON AND DISTRICT MIND
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1074288 THE BRECON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.23k | £4.02k | £111 | £19 | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £4.68k | £663 | £745 | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN GOOD HORTICULTURE AND THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE IMPROVEMENT OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
BRECKNOCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window