HAREHILLS ENGLISH LANGUAGE PROJECT TO BE KNOWN AS H.E.L.P.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching English to adult asylum seekers and refugees through free classes at various levels. A free 14-place creche is available to pre-school children. Lessons are given by volunteers on two mornings a week during school term times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 February 2021: CIO registration
- 27 September 2022: Funds received from 1138199 HAREHILLS ENGLISH LANGUAGE PROJECT TO BE KNOWN AS ...
- HAREHILLS ENGLISH LANGUAGE PROJECT TO BE KNOWN AS H.E.L.P (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DIANA ZANKER BA MPhil | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Sona Sakwe | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Iain Fraser | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DONNA KENNEDY BA PGCE | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NOBLE ACMA | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Noble | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
DR John Mitchell Lloyd Davies PhD CELTA | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Gibbons | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £53.27k | £25.15k | £56.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £24.43k | £35.76k | £41.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS LIVING IN LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA,PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING COURSES SUCH AS ENGLISH FOR SPEAKERS OF OTHER LANGUAGES, AND BRITISH CULTURE; AND TO PROVIDE PASTORAL CARE WHERE NEEDED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Aidan's Community Hall
Elford Place West
Leeds
LS8 5QD
- Phone:
- 07933291416
- Email:
- enquiries@help-esol.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window