GRACE CHURCH ISLE OF WIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship and teaching ministries. Courses and events to promote the Christian faith. Community services provision such as Foodbank and parent and toddler groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- GRACE CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN BELL | Chair | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
James Alexander Scott | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel Adams | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Henrick | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Matthew Hill | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Murray Linton | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Bell | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Oliver James Tucker | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Silk | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Wade | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Oct 2022 as amended on 10 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS A CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ACROSS THE ISLE OF WIGHT, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND TEACHING, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY AN INDEPENDENT CHURCH OPERATING ON CONGREGATIONAL PRINCIPLES; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH BY PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE3;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grace Church
Marlborough Road
Ryde
Isle of Wight
PO33 1AF
- Phone:
- 01983614717
- Email:
- steve@gracechurch-iow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window