SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1197675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDE ADVICE/ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL/EDUCATIONAL & OTHER ACTIVITIES TO: A) HELP YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS/CAPACITIES & CAPABILITIES ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT/MATURE/RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, BUILD THEIR SELF ESTEEM; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; C)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL/LEISURE ACTIVITY IN INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £193,357
Total expenditure: £176,697

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SYEP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Hagan Palmer Chair 01 January 2012
None on record
Timothy Gardiner Trustee 14 July 2024
None on record
Julia Everson Trustee 14 July 2024
None on record
Shayne Stork Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Karen Vincent Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
Martin Callam Trustee 10 July 2023
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
Sarah Vincent Trustee 07 February 2022
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
Judith Leggett Trustee 01 January 2012
None on record
Rev Simon Stokes Trustee 01 January 2012
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ESTATE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET LOWESTOFT
Received: On time
KEITH HIDER Trustee 01 January 2012
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £160.17k £193.36k
Total expenditure £132.03k £176.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.13k £25.42k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 April 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 April 2024 64 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Pavilion
Recreation Ground
Church Street
Old Catton
Norwich
Norfolk
Phone:
01603423880