PIPE UP FOR PIPE ORGANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes all aspects of the playing and appreciation of organ music, as well as the maintenance of neglected organs and the saving and re-homing of organs threatened with destruction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 July 2022: CIO registration
- 21 May 2024: Funds received from 275286 TORBAY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Edwin Allan | Chair | 08 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Lewis Keith Levi Hannaby | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Wilcox | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Renshaw MA | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Alan Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul Bowles MA | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.17k | £9.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £13.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE ARTS, HERITAGE AND CULTURE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC WITH THE FOCUS ON THE PROMOTION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND APPRECIATION OF THE PIPE ORGAN AS A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF PIPE ORGAN MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- A) THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF PIPE ORGANS; B) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND GUIDANCE AND THE TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF CRAFTSMEN AND OTHERS IN RELATION TO THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF PIPE ORGANS; C) THE PROVISION OF TEACHING OF ORGAN PLAYING AND ORGAN MUSIC; D) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC ORGAN RECITALS, VISITS, DEMONSTRATIONS AND PERFORMANCES; E) MAKING PIPE ORGANS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC INCLUDING BY ACQUIRING (WHETHER BY PURCHASE, GIFT OR LOAN OR OTHERWISE) PIPE ORGANS AND MAKING THEM AVAILABLE BY WAY OF SALE OR LOAN OR OTHERWISE; F) UNDERTAKING OR COMMISSIONING OR MAKING GRANTS TOWARDS THE STUDY OF, AND RESEARCH INTO, PIPE ORGANS, PIPE ORGAN MUSIC AND THE CONSERVATION OF PIPE ORGANS IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY RESEARCH; AND G) COMMISSIONING NEW MUSICAL WORKS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH S.7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND S.2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 PREBEND STREET
LONDON
N1 8PS
- Phone:
- 02073594625
- Email:
- info@pipe-up.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window