WESTBURY AND WARMINSTER YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A youth service running in Westbury and Warminster, Wiltshire working with young people aged 11-19 and 8-25 with SEN needs. As a service we offer in school 1-2-1 mentoring support, term time weekly youth club and SEN sessions, all year round detached youth work, a advocacy service and work alongside the youth probation service to deliver 1-2-1 and group based youth probation sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £36,499 from 8 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fredrick Beckett | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Avons | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Driver | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacie Allebsby | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie D'All | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Jones | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Cotterill | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.71k | £49.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.53k | £28.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.42k | £36.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 APR 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN WESTBURY AND WARMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AGED BETWEEN 11-19 (AND UP TO 25 WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES) THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WCP EDEN VALE ROAD
WESTBURY
BA13 3NU
- Phone:
- 07375792259
- Email:
- wwyouthclub@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window