HARGRAVE HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages Hargrave Hall, Girdlestone Community Centre and Harry Rice Hall in Archway London N19 , which are made available to a variety of groups and other users for the benefit of the local community. The halls host a complex and valuable variety of community groups serving the needs of many different members of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,588 from 2 government contract(s) and £44,822 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 05 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JOHN WHALE | Chair | 24 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Ikuko Evans | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Marilyn Tucker | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Williams | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT charles DOWD | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £121.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £107.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.59k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 May 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HARGRAVE HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE ( " THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; (3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE NORTH ISLINGTON (AND IN PARTICULAR JUNCTION, HILLRISE AND TOLLINGTON WARDS) AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREAS OF HARINGEY AND CAMDEN WITHIN THE BOUNDARY AS SET OUT ON THE MAP IN APPENDIX A.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARGRAVE HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE
HARGRAVE ROAD
LONDON
N19 5SP
- Phone:
- 02072635174
- Email:
- info@hargravehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window