ORCHARD HOUSE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education of pupils at Orchard House School of 16 Newton Grove, London W4 1LB in such manner and in all respects as the Trustees shall think fit, in particular through the award of bursaries, scholarships, exhibitions, prizes and grants to such pupils and prospective pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Ealing
Governance
- 08 April 2022: Standard registration
- 10 October 2023: Funds received from 1065898 HOUSE SCHOOLS TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHIP HUGH JOSEPH HORNE | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mina Nevin Sokmen-Kossoras | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lina Tebbs | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gizella Roberts | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimberly Dawn Groat | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALICIA CAROLINE HEENEMAN WONG | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Yam | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.81k | £132.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.37k | £13.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (?THE OBJECTS?) ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT ORCHARD HOUSE SCHOOL OF 16 NEWTON GROVE, LONDON W4 1LB IN SUCH MANNER AND IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): (I) THROUGH THE AWARD OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, PRIZES AND GRANTS TO SUCH PUPILS AND PROSPECTIVE PUPILS; AND (II) BY MAKING SUCH PAYMENTS AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SAID SCHOOL, ITS GROUNDS AND BUILDINGS (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OR RECREATIONAL AREAS AND FACILITIES), FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS (OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL PUBLICATIONS) AND EQUIPMENT (INCLUDING MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS) FOR THE SAID SCHOOL, AND BY FUNDING SPECIALIST TEACHING POSTS AT THE SAID SCHOOL, IN EVERY CASE INSOFAR AS THE SAME SHALL BE CHARITABLE; AND (B) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL AND ANY OTHER TYPE OF SUPPORT FOR SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORCHARD HOUSE SCHOOL
16 NEWTON GROVE
LONDON
W4 1LB
- Phone:
- 02087428544
- Email:
- info@orchardhs.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window