GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1199117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance or assist in the advancement of education consistent with the faith and practice of the Church of England for the public benefit in the Diocese of Gloucester, in particular by carrying out the functions of the Diocesan Board of Education for the Diocese under the provisions of the DBE Measure (2021).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 September 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Rt Revd Robert Wilfred Springett Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
SYLVANUS LYSONS CHARITY
Received: On time
GLOUCESTERSHIRE GATEWAY TRUST
Received: 13 days late
THE VINEY HILL CHRISTIAN ADVENTURE CENTRE
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Padfield Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Rachel Treweek Trustee 05 March 2024
GLOUCESTER MAGDALEN CHARITY
Received: On time
WARNEFORD ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
WARNEFORD CLERICAL TRUST
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
FEEDING BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Matthew Paul Andrews Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Rachel Gillian Beck Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Emma Joanne Mignaud Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Guy Rees Phillips Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Ian Bradley Moore Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Bernice Tricia Webber-Brown Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Alice Jaye Wood Trustee 05 March 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathon Paul Millin Trustee 05 March 2024
None on record
Dr Joan Margaret Grills Trustee 05 March 2024
None on record
Canon Rachel Elizabeth Howie Trustee 03 February 2024
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £178.51k £611.46k
Total expenditure £178.51k £630.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £588.75k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £22.71k
Income - Endowments N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £0
Income - Other N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £630.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £16.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A £0
Other assets N/A £266.76k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £286.04k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 1 JULY 1986 AND A FURTHER SCHEME OF 4 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2024 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ADVANCING OR ASSISTING IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR NON-FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ANY RELEVANT SCHOOL, ACADEMY OR ACADEMY TRUST (INCLUDING ANY ENDOWMENT FUND ASSOCIATED WITH SUCH RELEVANT SCHOOL, ACADEMY OR ACADEMY TRUST) IN THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER. (2) TO APPLY BOTH THE INCOME AND SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEE, IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE, IN ADVANCING OR ASSISTING IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER BY OR TOWARDS THE PURCHASE OF A SITE FOR, OR THE ERECTION, IMPROVEMENT OR ENLARGEMENT OF THE PREMISES OF ANY RELEVANT SCHOOL (WITH A PREFERENCE ONLY FOR PRIMARY SCHOOLS).
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER
Registration history
  • 06 September 1995 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 COLLEGE GREEN
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2LR
Phone:
01452835557