PATE'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are for the public benefit, to advance education by: the provision of land and buildings and funding to Pate's Grammar School; operating The Richard Pate School; and promoting the education of current or ex-pupils of both schools (e.g.scholarships, bursaries, grants). Remainng funds may be applied to relieving poverty by grants to Pate House Charity (almshouse charity).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 July 1976: Standard registration
- 31 October 1995: Removed
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Turner | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Wade | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHARLES HORWOOD | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Boulton | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
WALLACE PRIESTLEY ASCHAM | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Joseph Udale | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Clarke | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Bailey Bradshaw | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MORLEY MAY | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY: 1.1 THE PROVISION OF LAND, BUILDINGS, FURNISHINGS, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT TO THE ACADEMY TRUST KNOWN AS PATE'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR THE OPERATION OF AN ACADEMY FOR BOYS AND GIRLS ON THE SITE AT PRINCES ELIZABETH WAY, CHELTENHAM WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS (AS DEFINED IN SECTION 578 OF THE EDUCATION ACT 1996 AND INCLUDES ANY REGULATIONS MADE THEREUNDER); 1.2 THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR OR NOT NORMALLY MET FROM A FUNDING AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE SECRETARY OF STATE AND THE ACADEMY TRUST KNOWN AS PATES' GRAMMAR SCHOOL OPERATED ON THE SITE AT PRINCESS ELIZABETH WAY, CHELTENHAM; 1.3 THE PROVISION OF A JUNIOR SCHOOL (KNOWN AS THE RICHARD PATE SCHOOL) OR SUCH OTHER SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT, PROVIDED THAT RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SHALL BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH REGULATIONS MADE BY THE TRUSTEES; 1.4 PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ATTENDING OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED ANY SCHOOL OPERATED BY THE CHARITY OR THE ACADEMY KNOWN AS PATE'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL OPERATED FROM THE SITE AT PRINCESS ELIZABETH WAY, CHELTENHAM AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY: (A) AWARDING, SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF EDUCATION OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; AND (B) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSON TO PURSUE EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OF OTHER SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 2 IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS NOT REQUIRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE 3.1, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY MAKING GRANTS TO PATE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY AT CHELTENHAM, CURRENTLY KNOWN AS PATE HOUSE CHARITY.
Linked charities
- ARTHUR OWEN FUND (PATE'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL)
- CANON W E PLUMBRIDGE PRIZES FUND
- DADES-OVERTON SCHOLARSHIP
- DORA TAYLOR HISTORY PRIZE FUND
- EDWIN R RICHINGS BEQUEST
- GLADYS COULTER PRIZE FUND
- GWINNETT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- HEATLEY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- HEAWOOD PRIZE FUND
- JESSIE S YOUNG DIVINITY PRIZE FOUNDATION
- JESSOP MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- MARSHALL PRIZE FUND
- P R DOBSON MEMORIAL PRIZES FUND
- PATE'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
- PATE'S LIBRARY FUND
- PATE'S PRIZE FUND
- PATE'S SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- PERCIVAL GREEN HISTORY PRIZE FUND
- RUSSELL KELLY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- SIR ROWLAND HARRY BIFFEN TRUST FUND
- THE COSSENS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- THE DANIEL LIPSON PRIZE (BOYS) FUND
- THE DANIEL LIPSON PRIZE (GIRLS) FUND
- THE DAVID HOWELL PRIZE
- THE NASH SKILLICORNE SCHOLARSHIP
- THE OLDLAND MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- THE ROBINS MUSIC PRIZE
- URSULA MOTTRAM PRIZES FUND
- 26 July 1976 : Standard registration
- 31 October 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Richard Pate School
Southern Road
CHELTENHAM
GL53 9RP
- Phone:
- 01242522052
- Email:
- bursar@richardpate.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window