SCRUM THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCRUM creates excellent, accessible performances for the public benefit throughout the UK, with a particular focus on postcodes under-funded for the arts. Along with live performances, we deliver workshops and digital resources to students, teachers, and emerging makers, in order to nurture a new generation of audiences and makers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramin Eitan Musa Sabi | Chair | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Mihaela van der Schaar | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Penelope Elizabeth Saward | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Pasfield | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
SIR DAVID CHARLES MAURICE BELL | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Niamh O'Flaherty | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ella Thorpe-Beeston | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE ART OF DRAMA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY PRODUCING AND PROMOTING PERFORMANCE EVENTS OF AN EXCEPTIONAL QUALITY FOR THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD, AND TO ADVANCE THEATRE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A FOCUS ON DEVELOPING THE CREATIVE SKILLS OF PARTICIPANTS, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND DIGITAL RESOURCES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR: • SCHOOL AGE STUDENTS FROM KEY STAGES 1-4; • TEACHERS OF THOSE STUDENTS; AND • EMERGING ARTISTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CONSTITUTION, THE TERM ‘EMERGING ARTISTS’ MEANS PERSONS OF ANY CREATIVE DISCIPLINE IN THE THEATRE INDUSTRY WHO FALL INTO ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING CATEGORIES: • DESIRES SUPPORT TO GAIN THEATRE-MAKING SKILLS • HAS FEWER THAN FIVE PROFESSIONAL CREDITS • DOES NOT RECEIVE A SALARY FOR MAKING THEATRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
191 Talgarth Road
London
W6 8BJ
- Phone:
- 07927637198
- Email:
- co-leads@scrumtheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window