CYRENAEUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cyrenaeus seeks to provide surgical procedures to people in Cameroon, Uganda, Ghana, Togo and Benin who require plastic surgery intervention for previously existing conditions. The Charity will also facilitate volunteers to deliver training to medical professionals in the countries listed above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Benin
- Cameroon
- Ghana
- Togo
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 April 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONIO ORLANDO MD, FRCS | Chair | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giulia Colavitti | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MIRABAL | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £972 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 SEP 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS IN CAMEROON, UGANDA, GHANA, TOGO AND BENIN WHO REQUIRE RECONSTRUCTIVE PLASTIC SURGERY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS IN THE RELEVANT FIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRANDPONT HOUSE
ABINGDON ROAD
OXFORD
OX1 4LD
- Phone:
- 07483167885
- Email:
- jimmirabal@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window