NORTH STAFFS AND SOUTH CHESHIRE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1201926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity seeks to improve the lives of those who suffer with any and all aspects of chronic kidney disease and who are treated by or at the University Hospital of North Midlands Trust at locations in Stoke on Trent, County Hospital, Stafford and Leighton Hospital, Crewe.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,174
Total expenditure: £2,528

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID KERBY Chair 26 January 2023
NORTH STAFFS AND SOUTH CHESHIRE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Lesley Ann Lloyd Trustee 26 January 2023
WEST END METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NORTH STAFFS AND SOUTH CHESHIRE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
JUDITH MARY NEWCOMBE Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
NEIL JAMES GARBETT Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
EUNICE ELIZABETH FINNEY Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.17k
Total expenditure £2.53k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Avon Drive
Congleton
CW12 3RG
Phone:
07790953305
Website:

nssckpa.org