SUPPORTING HEALTHCARE HEROES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SHH-UK aims to provide relief both financially as one-off grants for loss of income, or for other needs arising from the effects of Long Covid. SHH-UK also aims to raise awareness of Long Covid amongst policymakers, healthcare providers and the general public so that healthcare workers are better supported at home and/or at work. We will also support research into Long Covid and share the results.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison Mary Twycross | Chair | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Rosenbaum | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adebola Abdulazeez Badiru | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dolores Macchiavello | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Martin Bolger | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Trewern | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michaela Catherine Barnard | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £792 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2023 as amended on 08 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST HEALTHCARE WORKERS ACROSS THE UK WHO DEVELOPED LONG COVID DURING THE COURSE OF THEIR PROFESSIONAL DUTIES, WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE STILL EMPLOYED, BY PROVIDING: A. FINANCIAL SUPPORT WITH HEALTHCARE NEEDS ARISING FROM LONG COVID THAT ARE NOT PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; B. FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO MEET A PARTICULAR NEED THAT ARISES AS A RESULT OF A DROP IN INCOME; AND C. FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF HEALTHCARE WORKERS ACROSS THE UK WHO DEVELOPED LONG COVID DURING THE COURSE OF THEIR PROFESSIONAL DUTIES, WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE STILL EMPLOYED, BY: A. RAISING AWARENESS OF LONG COVID, ITS TREATMENT, RECOVERY AND REHABILITATION AMONG HEALTH POLICYMAKERS, HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC; B. MAKING KNOWN TO HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS AND HEALTH POLICYMAKERS THE VIEWS AND LIVED EXPERIENCE OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SUFFERING FROM OR AFFECTED BY LONG COVID; AND C. SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO LONG COVID, ITS DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION FROM IT AND THE DISSEMINATION OF USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE OBJECTS ‘LONG COVID’ MEANS POST-ACUTE COVID-19 SYNDROME, WHERE SYMPTOMS AND/OR LONG-TERM COMPLICATIONS OCCUR BEYOND FOUR WEEKS FROM INITIAL INFECTION OR SYMPTOM ONSET TO INCLUDE ANY POST VIRAL ILLNESS WITH A SUSPECTED OR EVIDENCED LINK TO COVID-19.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Station Road
Haddenham
AYLESBURY
HP17 8AN
- Phone:
- 07384554161
- Email:
- info@shh-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window