VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Responsible for the management and maintenance of a community building on behalf of the residents of Langley-On-Tyne and surrounding district. The building is hired out to individuals and organisations for a variety of educational, social and recreational activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £3,493
Total expenditure: £5,272

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LANGLEY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derek Wilson Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Peter Brownbridge Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Joanne Bates Trustee 25 October 2016
HAYDON BRIDGE AND HAYDON PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Kathleen Margaret Rutherford Trustee
None on record
GAYLE ELIZABETH TAILFORD Trustee
None on record
LAURA ANNE GILHESPY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.33k £12.89k £26.17k £5.95k £3.49k
Total expenditure £7.88k £2.98k £13.37k £11.46k £5.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £23.92k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 August 2024 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BEACON RIGG FARM
LANGLEY-ON-TYNE
HEXHAM
NE47 5LF
Phone:
01434683365
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available