124TH NOTTINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 522458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting - a wide range of activities for boys and girls from ages 6 up to 18

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £49,234
Total expenditure: £34,902

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Huw Edward Williams Chair 01 October 2021
None on record
Helen Clements Trustee 25 March 2024
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Adam Dakin Trustee 19 November 2023
None on record
Simon Francis Grayling Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
Claire North Trustee 24 July 2023
None on record
Alison Smith Trustee 10 June 2022
None on record
John Ashton Trustee 10 June 2022
NOTTINGHAM MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Scott Lammas Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
David Atkins Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.17k £17.70k £41.71k £54.10k £49.23k
Total expenditure £32.82k £14.96k £39.59k £55.35k £34.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £21.46k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
124th Nottingham Scout Group
Bramcote Lane
Wollaton
Nottingham
NG8 2ND
Phone:
0115000000